Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Visual Impairments - Requirements for School Personnel Training, Student Screening, and Maryland Medical Assistance Program Coverage
Sponsored by
Senators Bates, Eckardt, Ready, Salling, and Robinson
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a vision screening provided to specified students in public schools to include the administration of a computerized screening for visual impairments that includes, at a minimum, specified tests; requiring each county board on or before July 1, 2018, to require school personnel who conduct vision screenings for students to complete training on understanding and recognizing the symptoms of visual impairments; requiring each county board to approve a course that meets specified criteria; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0458
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {574830/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {505560/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {193424/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text - First - Visual Impairments - Requirements for Teacher Training, Student Screening, and Maryland Medical Assistance Program Coverage
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {574830/1 Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Text - Third - Visual Impairments - Requirements for School Personnel Training, Student Screening, and Maryland Medical Assistance Program Coverage
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Ways and Means Health and Government Operations 43
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {505560/1 Adopted 67
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Floor Amendment {193424/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 69
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM