Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Deputy Secretary - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Robey, Kasemeyer, Manno, McFadden, Peters, Brinkley, Feldman, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the number of deputy secretaries to be appointed by the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene with the approval of the Governor; requiring the Secretary, with the approval of the Governor, to appoint the Deputy Secretary for Developmental Disabilities; eliminating the position of Director of the Developmental Disabilities Administration and establishing as the head of the Administration the Deputy Secretary for Developmental Disabilities; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {237874/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments {237874/1 Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 40
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 43
House 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 62
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-103, 7-1003, 7-1005, 7-1007, 7-101, 7-1010, 7-1011, 7-201, 7-202, 7-206, 7-501, 7-502, 7-801, 7-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM