Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Education Credit
Sponsored by
Senators DeGrange, Astle, Brinkley, Colburn, Currie, Dyson, Getty, Glassman, Hershey, Jacobs, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Peters, Reilly, Simonaire, and Stone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing a tax credit against the State income tax for contributions made to specified student assistance organizations; requiring the Department of Business and Economic Development to administer the tax credit; requiring specified entities to submit an application to be a student assistance organization on or before December 1 of each year; establishing the Maryland Education Tax Credit Reserve Fund; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1262
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/30/2014 Text - First - Maryland Education Credit
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-205, 10-306, 10-736 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM