Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of Death
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors to issue an executor license to an applicant if the applicant is the appointed personal representative of a deceased surviving spouse's estate under specified circumstances; requiring an applicant for an executor license to submit to the Board within a specified time period the name of a licensed funeral director or mortician who has agreed to apply for a specified pre-need trustee license; requiring the Board to provide for the term of an executor license; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1042
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {754339/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {966581/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing 2/14 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {754339/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/18/2014 3/15/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 51
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {966581/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0) 62
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendment 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-308.1, 7-308.2, 7-308.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM