Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Senators Kasemeyer, Madaleno, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Attorney General to take specified actions regarding civil and criminal suits and actions that are based on the federal government's action or inaction that threatens the public interest and welfare of the residents of the State; requiring the Attorney General, to provide the Governor with specified notice and an opportunity to review and comment on specified suits and actions; requiring the Governor to provide $1,000,000 in fiscal year 2019 and thereafter to carry out the specified provisions and to employ five attorneys; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0913
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM