Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Land Use - Local Comprehensive Planning and Zoning Cycle
Sponsored by
Senators Conway and Dyson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the time period of the comprehensive planning and zoning cycles of specified local jurisdictions to better coincide with the release of United States decennial census data; requiring a specified annual planning report to contain a specified narrative on the implementation of a specified comprehensive plan; requiring the Department of Planning along with the Maryland Association of Counties and the Maryland Municipal League to create a specified transition schedule to lengthen specified comprehensive planning cycles; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654331/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {270111/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-3)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments {654331/1 Report Adopted 33
Senate 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 37
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {270111/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-3) 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-207, 1-416, 1-417, 1-509, 3-301, 3-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM