Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Referendum Petitions
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Kelley, Montgomery, and Robey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the earliest date by which a nonemergency law may take effect; altering the date by which petitions to refer a law to referendum must be filed; requiring the Secretary of State to refer specified laws to referendum at specified elections if sufficient petitions are filed; altering the number of signatures required to refer a law to referendum; repealing provisions requiring that petitions containing a specified number of signatures be filed by specified dates; etc.
Committees
Details
Constitutional Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/05/2013 Text - First - Referendum Petitions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM