Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain
Sponsored by
Senator Beidle
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain person operating on behalf of a venue or an entertainment event to use the word "official" in a certain lower- level domain name; and requiring certain ticket resellers to use the word "reseller" in the lower-level domain name in the URL of a ticket website.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1415
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-4003 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM