Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income and Sales Tax Incentives - Emergency Preparedness Equipment
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a qualified nursing home to claim a refundable credit against the State income tax in the amount of sales and use tax paid for the purchase of a backup generator; establishing an annual tax-free period from May 19 through May 24 during which a sales tax exemption for specified sales of emergency preparedness equipment is provided; requiring the Comptroller to publish a list of emergency preparedness equipment; applying specified provisions of the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013, but before January 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0784
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014, October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-736, 11-228.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM