Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore City
Sponsored by
Senator Jones-Rodwell (By Request - Baltimore City Administration) and Senator Ferguson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that specified provisions of law granting a person who is issued special registration plates for individuals with disabilities the authority to park for unlimited periods of time in specified restricted parking zones do not supersede local ordinances in Baltimore City that restrict parking for vehicles that do not display specified residential parking permits.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0770
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/6 (Delegate Malone) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate Malone) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-3)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Second Reading Passed 45
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 49
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Special Order until 4/6 (Delegate Malone) Adopted 62
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate Malone) Adopted 65
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-3) 69
Senate 4/09/2013 4/07/2013 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-616 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM