Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Horse Racing License - Land Preservation Trust - Shawan Downs
Sponsored by
Senators Jennings and Brochin
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the State Racing Commission to issue a license to a certain trust to hold racing at one 1-day race meeting a year at Shawan Downs; authorizing the licensee to choose, subject to the Commission's approval, the racing date; requiring the licensee to reimburse the Commission for certain costs; requiring the licensee to allocate certain profits in a certain manner; requiring a certain licensee to make certain deductions from a certain handle; requiring that certain money, after certain deductions, be returned as winnings; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Horse Racing License - Land Preservation Trust - Shawan Downs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Horse Racing License - Land Preservation Trust - Shawan Downs
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   11-7A-01 through 11-7A-03 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page