Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - Restrictions
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Office of the Attorney General)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a debt buyer or a specified debt collector from collecting or attempting to collect an alleged debt under specified circumstances; prohibiting a debt buyer or a specified collector from filing a civil action or initiating an arbitration or specified legal proceeding under specified circumstances; prohibiting a debt buyer or a specified collector from collecting or attempting to collect specified attorney's fees or specified interest under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1159
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/08/2016 3/09/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-201 through 14-204, 14-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM