Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - 2+2 Transfer Scholarship
Sponsored by
Senators Currie, Benson, Colburn, Conway, DeGrange, Dyson, Edwards, Ferguson, Forehand, Getty, Jones-Rodwell, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, McFadden, Montgomery, Muse, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Robey, Rosapepe, Stone, Young, Pinsky, and Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the Community College Transfer Scholarship to be the 2+2 Transfer Scholarship and altering specified elements of the Program; altering the qualifications for the scholarship and the annual amount of the award; specifying that the scholarship may be used for 3 years, or six semesters, whichever is longer; requiring at least $2,000,000 to be transferred from the Need-Based Student Financial Assistance Fund under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1215
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174731/1
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174731/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {263829/1
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Motion appeal decision of the Chair (Senator Kittleman) Rejected (41-5)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
President ruled amendment out of order under Rule 45
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable with Amendments {174731/1 42
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Laid Over (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 42
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable with Amendments {174731/1 Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {263829/1 43
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Motion appeal decision of the Chair (Senator Kittleman) Rejected (41-5) 43
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/13/2014 3/09/2014 President ruled amendment out of order under Rule 45 43
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 45
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 47
House 3/25/2014 3/25/2014 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 18-101, 18-107, 18-2501 through 18-2506, 18-2507 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM