Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Baltimore Museum of Industry
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $500,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Trustees of the Baltimore Museum of Industry, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Baltimore Museum of Industry, located in Baltimore City; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0432
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2017 were amended into the State's Capital budget (SB 191). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended SB 191 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM