Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Second Chance Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Benson, Feldman, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Muse, Pugh, and Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to petition the court to shield specified court records and police records relating to a conviction of the person no earlier than 3 years after the person satisfies the sentence imposed for the conviction, including parole, probation, or mandatory supervision; providing that, if the person is convicted of a new crime during a specified time period, the original conviction is not eligible for shielding unless the new conviction becomes eligible for shielding; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1166
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301 through 10-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM