Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Correcting certain errors or omissions in certain articles of the Annotated Code and in certain uncodified laws; clarifying language; correcting certain obsolete references; reorganizing certain sections of the Annotated Code; ratifying certain corrections made by the publishers of the Annotated Code; providing that the Act is not intended to affect any law other than to correct technical errors; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 7 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Annual Corrective Bill
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Annual Corrective Bill
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Annual Corrective Bill
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Annual Corrective Bill
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Annual Corrective Bill
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Returned Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Text - Chapter - Annual Corrective Bill
(   2-313.1 )
(   18-1101, 18-1605, 20-2002, 2-203, 2-217, 22-805, 25-903, 26-1601, 31-1306, 31-701, 32-501, 33-902, 4-204, 6-311 )
(   16.7-204, 5-503 )
(   10-801, 2-113.1, 4-203, 7-206, 7-309, 7-401, 8-102, 8-604, 9-201 )
(   10-107 )
(   10-110, 11-912, 1-203.1, 16-210, 6-223, 6-224 )
(   12-605, 5-301, 6-801 )
(   11-105, 16-310, 18-1901, 18-19A-01, 18-19B-01, 18-407, 23-109, 3-1004, 3-2A-05, 4-201, 4-318, 9.5-803 )
(   10-303, 12-103, 13-247, 13-307, 13-309.1, 13-336, 4-203, 5-305, 5-701, 6-103 )
(   4-202.1, 9-1605.3, 9-349 )
(   10-103, 13-711, 14.5-105, 14-402, 4-503, 7-602 )
(   5-209, 5-505, 5-514 )
(   13-1007, 13-1008, 16-201.3, 19-347, 20-1004, 24-307, 5-621 )
(   1-301, 1-302, 2-202, 4-101 )
(   10-413, 10-445, 10-507, 10-508, 3-101, 9-312, 9-406, 9-407 )
(   10-108, 10-111, 10-118, 15-121, 15-1212, 15-123, 15-1309, 15-1402, 19-112, 19-804, 24-211, 31-113, 4-303, 5-306, 8-419, 9-414 )
(   11-902, 3-413, 8-617, 8-806, 9-234 )
(   4-701, 5-101, 8-403 )
(   3-511, 3-512 )
(   11B-111.1, 14-125.1 )
(   2-706, 2-709, 6.5-101, 9-1A-04, 9-1A-36, 9-3001, 9-957 )
(   10-205, 11-411, 13-203, 2-107 )
(   9-210, 9-258 )
(   13-616, 16-303, 16-404.1, 21-406, 25-102, 7-208, 8-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page