Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Participating Governmental Units - Amortization Schedule
Sponsored by
Senator Peters (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of the accrued liability contributions required to be paid by a participating governmental unit on account of members of the Employees' Retirement System and Employees' Pension System who are employees of a participating governmental unit; and clarifying the application of a specified amortization period to specified legislative changes.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1397
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 8:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 8:00 a.m.
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/12/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed 43
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 45
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Appropriations 46
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 62
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM