Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education Program - Membership, Duties, and Extension
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the membership and duties of the Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Program; and changing the date from December 30, 2015, to December 30, 2016, by which the Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education Program is required to submit specified findings and recommendations to the Governor and to specified committees of the General Assembly.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0895
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {335663/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 34
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 38
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {335663/1 Report Adopted 58
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) 59
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Passed Enrolled 58
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM