Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful Evictions
Sponsored by
Senator Conway (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an agent, a landlord, or an operator from making false representations or statements to tenants in violation of certain laws in Baltimore City; prohibiting certain individuals from making false representations or statements in connection with certain proceedings in Baltimore City; prohibiting certain individuals from trying to circumvent certain rights afforded to tenants in connection with the denial of ingress to or egress from a dwelling, intentionally diminishing certain services, or penalizing certain tenants; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1553
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {598877/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful Evictions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {598877/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful Evictions
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 48
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 47
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful Evictions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM