Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Estate Brokers - Agency Relationships in Residential Real Estate Transactions - Disclosure and Consent Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the requirements for a specified disclosure that a licensee of the State Real Estate Commission must make under specified circumstances; establishing a specified exception to a specified disclosure requirement; establishing specified exceptions to the time when a specified disclosure must occur; requiring the Commission to prepare and provide a specified required notice; requiring a subagent to make a specified required disclosure under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1469
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {634137/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/18/2017 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {634137/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 47
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 65
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-528, 17-530, 17-533 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM