Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 1/27/2021 12:47:57 PM
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: January 27, 2021 11:34 AM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
January 28, 2021 11:00 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0001
Sen Sydnor, et al

Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
SB0496
The Pres (Admin)

Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act

Executive Nominations Committee
Change made: January 27, 2021 11:14 AM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Appear
February 1, 2021 5:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
** For the full list of nominees, go to the current hearing schedule

Change made: January 27, 2021 11:15 AM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Not Appear
February 1, 2021 5:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
** For the full list of nominees, go to the current hearing schedule

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: January 27, 2021 10:06 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 11, 2021 11:00 AM
(Previous Date/Time: February 11, 2021 1:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
SB0383
Sen Cassilly

Court Order to Use a Cell Site Simulator or Obtain Location Information From an Electronic Device - Procedures
SB0385
Sen Cassilly

Organized Retail Theft
SB0395
Sen Carter

Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children
SB0400
Sen Carter

Hate Crimes - False Statement to a Law Enforcement Officer
SB0406
Sen Augustine

Public Safety - Local Youth Violence Review Committees
SB0420
Sen Carter

Criminal Law – Drug Paraphernalia for Administration – Decriminalization
SB0440
Sen Lee

Courts - Wiretapping - Misconduct in Office
SB0443
Sen West

Crimes - Malicious Destruction of Historically Significant Monument (Monument Protection Act of 2021)
SB0456
Sen Sydnor

Office of the State's Attorney - Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information
SB0471
Sen Washington (By Request)

Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties - Alterations
SB0479
Sen Smith

Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements (Jaelynn's Law)
SB0505
Sen Hettleman

Criminal Law - First-Degree Child Abuse - Continuing Course of Conduct

Change made: January 27, 2021 10:06 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 16, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0519
Sen Klausmeier

Estates and Trusts - Wills and Advance Medical Directives - Notaries Public
ADDED: 10:06 AM
SB0527
Sen Lee, et al

Criminal Procedure - Probation Before Judgment - Facts Justifying a Finding of Guilt and Suspension of Sentence
ADDED: 10:06 AM
SB0531
Sen Kelley, et al

Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Imposition
ADDED: 10:06 AM
SB0553
Sen Young

Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
ADDED: 10:06 AM
SB0559
Sen Ready

Drunk and Drugged Driving - Testing - Warrants
ADDED: 10:06 AM
SB0561
Sens Hershey and Eckardt

Electric Cooperatives - Meetings - Alterations
ADDED: 10:06 AM
SB0569
The Pres (Admin)

Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards - Applications and Renewals
ADDED: 10:06 AM

Change made: January 27, 2021 10:06 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 17, 2021 1:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 17, 2021 11:00 AM)
Zoom / YouTube
SB0494
Sen West, et al

Juveniles Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Limitations and Reduction (Juvenile Restoration Act)
SB0497
Sen Kelley, et al

Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties
SB0515
Sen Klausmeier

Criminal Procedure – Registered Sex Offenders – Entry Onto School Property
ADDED: 10:06 AM
SB0555
Sen Young

Criminal Procedure – Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior – Required Meeting
ADDED: 10:06 AM
SB0560
Sen Ready, et al

Criminal Law - Theft of a Handgun
ADDED: 10:06 AM

Change made: January 27, 2021 10:06 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 18, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0524
The Pres (Atty Gen Ofc)

Environment - Multidefendant Oil and Hazardous Substance Pollution Cases - Effect of Settlement
SB0530
The Pres (Atty Gen Ofc), et al

Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions
SB0535
Sen King

Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements

House
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee
Change made: January 27, 2021 12:06 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Briefing
February 3, 2021 10:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
- Briefing from the Office of Program Evaluation and Government Affairs (OPEGA) on Emergency Procurement policies

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: January 27, 2021 12:08 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
February 3, 2021 10:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
- Briefing from the Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability (OPEGA) on emergency procurement policies

Change made: January 27, 2021 12:36 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 10, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0709
Del Krebs

Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Drug Reimbursement - Reporting Requirements
ADDED: 12:36 PM
HB0731
The Spkr (Admin)

Telehealth Services – Expansion
ADDED: 12:36 PM
HB0732
The Spkr (Admin)

Health Care Practitioners - Telehealth - Out-of-State Health Care Practitioners
ADDED: 12:36 PM

Judiciary Committee
Change made: January 27, 2021 11:45 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
January 29, 2021 2:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0009
Del Shetty

Family Law - Mandatory Reporter Training
HB0039
Del Shetty

Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
HB0100
Del D.M. Davis

Correctional Services - Inmate Cost-of-Living Report - Maryland Correctional Enterprises Diversity Report
HB0147
Del Crutchfield, et al

Criminal Law – Sexual Crimes – Repeal of Spousal Defense (Love Is No Defense to Sexual Crimes)
HB0243
Del Atterbeary

Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
HB0289
Del Atterbeary

Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
HB0324
Del Moon

Criminal Law - Marijuana - Possession and Possession With Intent to Distribute
HB0347
Del Shetty

Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 27, 2021 11:14 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 10, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0665
Del Boteler

Education - Public Charter Schools - Virtual Learning Programs
HB0692
Cecil County Delegation

Cecil County - Board of Education - Member Terms and Compensation
HB0700
Del Ruth

Education - Disruption of School Activities - Repeal of Prohibition
HB0713
Del Guyton

County Boards of Education - Therapy Dogs - Policy for Handling and Use in Schools
HB0714
Del Guyton

Special Education - Learning Continuity Plan - Requirement
HB0715
Del Guyton

Public Schools - Self-Contained Special Education Classrooms - Use of Video Recording Devices
HB0716
Del Griffith

Special Education – Individualized Education Programs – Educational Evaluations

Other
Baltimore County
Change made: January 27, 2021 7:27 AM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore County - Other
January 29, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing: Senator Chris Van Hollen
Bill Hearings: HB181, HB249

Montgomery
Change made: January 27, 2021 11:28 AM - HEARING ADDED
Montgomery - Other
February 1, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation's Land Use, Transportation, and Public Safety Committee.

Southern Maryland
Change made: January 27, 2021 11:21 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Southern Maryland - Other
January 29, 2021 9:00 AM
(Previous Date/Time: January 29, 2021 9:30 AM)
Zoom / YouTube
Delegation Meeting

Click to return on the top page