Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Inflation Adjustment
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt, Bates, Edwards, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Madaleno, and Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the amount of certain exemptions allowed under the State income tax for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018, by a certain cost-of-living adjustment.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0236 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Inflation Adjustment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Inflation Adjustment
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-211 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM