Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Sponsored by
Senator Conway (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering procedures for filing a complaint with the Baltimore City Civilian Review Board; repealing specified time limits on filing a complaint; authorizing a complainant to request that a complaint be confidential until the Board makes a specified finding; providing for procedures for specified confidential complaints; altering the authority of the Board to issue specified subpoenas; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1262
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-41, 16-42, 16-43, 16-44, 16-45, 16-46 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM