Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pimlico Community Development Authority – Membership
Sponsored by
Senator Conway (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Pimlico Community Development Authority; repealing the requirement that the Baltimore City Planning Director serve as the Chair of the Authority; and requiring the Mayor of Baltimore City to appoint the Chair of the Authority.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0796
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pimlico Community Development Authority – Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Pimlico Community Development Authority – Membership
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Hearing canceled
(   11-1202, 11-1203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page