Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Individual Sureties - Regulation
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified individual sureties to register each year with the Maryland Insurance Administration in a specified manner and for specified purposes; specifying the contents of the initial and renewal registration application forms; providing for the review and approval or denial of a registration application; providing for the expiration date of a registration; prohibiting individual sureties who are not registered from issuing or soliciting specified surety bonds for specified purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2014 3/18/2014 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-104, 27-406.1, 4-205 )
(   2006, 2008 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM