Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employees – Parental Leave
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Benson, Currie, Madaleno, Rosapepe, Smith, Zucker, Middleton, Klausmeier, Feldman, and Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 752
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain State employees may be entitled to parental leave with pay; establishing a maximum of 60 days of parental leave that employees may use for the care and nurturing of a child immediately following the birth or adoption of the child; requiring certain State agencies to provide an employee with additional paid leave to attain 60 days of parental leave if the employee's available amount of accrued annual leave, sick leave, and personal leave is less than 60 days; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0775
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0687 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Employees – Parental Leave
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {987378/1
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {987378/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Employees – Parental Leave
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-11)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {114467/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {743028/1 (Delegate Arentz) Rejected (47-91)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-41)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Astle, Reilly and Klausmeier)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Astle, Reilly and Klausmeier)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates A. Miller, Korman and Vogt)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates A. Miller, Korman and Vogt)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {173323/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-10)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {173323/1 Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-40)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Employees – Parental Leave
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 752
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter -
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Employees – Parental Leave
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {987378/1 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hough) Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {987378/1 Adopted 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Text - Third - State Employees – Parental Leave
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (36-11) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Appropriations 50
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {114467/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Floor Amendment {743028/1 (Delegate Arentz) Rejected (47-91) 60
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (96-41) 60
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Astle, Reilly and Klausmeier) 66
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Astle, Reilly and Klausmeier) 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Refuses Recede 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates A. Miller, Korman and Vogt) 68
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Refuses Recede 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates A. Miller, Korman and Vogt) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Conference Committee Report {173323/1 Adopted 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (34-10) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Conference Committee Report {173323/1 Adopted 70
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (100-40) 70
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Employees – Parental Leave
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 752
Text - Chapter -
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM