Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Insurance – Certificates of Insurance – Fee
Sponsored by
Senators Astle and Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that an insurance producer is not prohibited from charging and collecting a fee, not exceeding $30, for services rendered in issuing a certain certificate of insurance or other evidence of coverage on behalf of a commercial policyholder under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1179
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Insurance – Certificates of Insurance – Fee
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Commercial Insurance – Certificates of Insurance – Fee
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-216 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM