Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Office of the Attorney General) and Senators Feldman and Rosapepe
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the maximum civil penalty that may be assessed against a person for a violation of the Maryland Antitrust Act from $100,000 to $10,000 for each violation; and providing that each day a violation of the Act continues is a separate violation.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1544
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-48)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable Adopted 30
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Second Reading Passed 30
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 32
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Economic Matters 33
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (89-48) 56
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848
Text - Chapter - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM