Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Weighted Caseload Analysis - Study
Sponsored by
Senator Kasemeyer
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Resources to study the feasibility of performing a specified weighted caseload analysis to consider the number and type of public assistance cases handled by personnel of the Family Investment Administration and local departments and the time and effort required for specified cases; requiring the Department to submit to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly a report on the results of the study on or before December 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1190
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {697079/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {697079/1 Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Appropriations 50
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM