Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 728
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that the compensation of the Executive Director for the State Retirement Agency and certain staff shall be as provided in the State budget; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to adopt criteria for setting the qualifications and compensation of the Chief Investment Officer for the System; establishing the Objective Criteria Committee of the Board of Trustees to make recommendations regarding the compensation of the Chief Investment Officer and positions in the Investment Division; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1012
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {269237/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {454768/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {623823/1 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 728
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m.
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments {269237/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Appropriations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {454768/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Floor Amendment {623823/1 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 728
Text - Chapter - State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division
(   21-118, 21-118.1, 21-122, 21-123.2, 21-201, 21-303, 21-315, 21-316 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page