Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Elections by Mail
Sponsored by
Senators Dyson and Conway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that elections be conducted by mail; requiring the State Board of Elections, in consultation with the local boards of elections, to select a specified voting system; requiring local boards of elections to mail a ballot to specified voters by specified deadlines; requiring a voter who receives a ballot to take specified action to vote the ballot; providing for the methods by which a voter may return a ballot; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2013 2/11/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/12/2013 Text - First - Election Law - Elections by Mail
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101 through 10-315, 1-101, 11-202, 11-303, 11-403, 16-201, 16-203, 16-205, 16-206, 16-207, 16-303, 16-304, 16-801 through 16-804, 2-202, 2-303, 9-101 through 9-105, 9-101 through 9-107, 9-205, 9-401 through 9-408, 9-501 through 9-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM