Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Federal Elementary and Secondary Education Act - Waiver Requests
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Benson, Colburn, Currie, Feldman, Forehand, Kasemeyer, King, Klausmeier, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Montgomery, Pinsky, and Young
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to submit a request for a waiver from the federal Elementary and Secretary Education Act to the Legislative Policy Committee of the General Assembly before the Department submits the proposed waiver request to the United States Department of Education and to give the Committee a specified amount of time to review and comment; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1001
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654738/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments {654738/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 62
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM