Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Sex Trafficking
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "sexual abuse" in provisions of law relating to children in need of assistance to include an act that involves the sex trafficking of a child by any individual; and defining the terms "sexual molestation or exploitation" and "sex trafficking" in provisions of law relating to children in need of assistance.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1219
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Children in Need of Assistance - Sex Trafficking
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Children in Need of Assistance - Sex Trafficking
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Children in Need of Assistance - Sex Trafficking
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Children in Need of Assistance - Sex Trafficking
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed 43
Text - Third - Children in Need of Assistance - Sex Trafficking
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Judiciary 46
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Text - Chapter - Children in Need of Assistance - Sex Trafficking
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM