Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Parole and Probation Employees - Membership in Correctional Officers' Retirement System
Sponsored by
Senators Peters and McFadden
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the positions eligible for membership in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System to include specified agents of the Division of Parole and Probation of the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services; authorizing specified individuals to cease membership in the Employees' Pension System and enroll in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; authorizing specified individuals to transfer service credit from the Employees' Pension System to the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1209
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM