Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Special Appointments in the Skilled and Professional Services
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Chief Executive Officer of Maryland Correctional Enterprises and the Secretary of Human Resources to transfer, on or before July 1, 2017, specified special appointment positions to specified employment categories of the State Personnel and Management System; establishing that certain staff in the Child Support Enforcement Administration may not be considered special appointments; repealing the special appointment status of specified employees of the Office of the Attorney General; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1161
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Personnel - Special Appointments in the Skilled and Professional Services
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM