Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Electronic Communications - Privacy
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Shank, Currie, Feldman, Forehand, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Middleton, and Ramirez
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the application of a provision of law that requires an investigative or law enforcement officer to obtain a specified search warrant in order to require a provider of wire or electronic communication service to disclose the contents of wire or electronic communications system for 180 days or less to a wire or electronic communication that is in electronic storage for any amount of time.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0912
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {968574/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
63
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {968574/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 63
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM