Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 9/23/2020 7:36:39 PM
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
Senate
Created: 9/4/2020 11:50 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee
1:00 PM to 5:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Meeting Material
Click here to sign up for Oral Testimony
Meeting Video
Bill Hearings on Police Accountability and Law Enforcement Reform

House
Created: 9/21/2020 1:57 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Full Committee Briefing
Meeting Material
Meeting Video
1) Natural Gas Infrastructure in Baltimore City: Labyrinth Road update; STRIDE and Pipeline Maintenance
2) Utility Moratorium: Arrearage Management, Budget Billing, and Public Assistance
(Added - 9/21/2020 1:59 PM)
<br> 2) Utility Moratorium: Arrearage Management, Budget Billing, and Public Assistance
(Removed - 9/21/2020 1:59 PM)

Other
Board of Public Works
Created: 9/2/2020 2:10 PM
10:00 AM - Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Floor State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
The meeting will be conducted via webinar. To view click here
General Meeting

Economic Future of Western Maryland, Task Force on
Created: 9/9/2020 11:19 AM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Google Meet Video Conference
To view the meeting click here
Call in Phone #: (US) +1 617-674-4444
PIN: 567 826 835 4098#
Introduction to the Task Force.
Review the purpose of the Task Force.
Discuss the proposed work plans.

Legislative Policy Committee
Created: 9/16/2020 1:22 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom Meeting
Continued investigation into personnel and Board practices at the Maryland Environmental Service.