Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Boards of Education - Private Financing Authority
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a county board of education to seek private financing, subject to specified limitations, to finance specified projects or capital leases; requiring specified financing to be authorized by a specified resolution and secured by a specified document between specified parties; requiring a resolution to contain specified information; authorizing specified provisions under which private financing may be issued; requiring the county board to establish trust funds for the deposit of the proceeds of private financing; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-701, 5-702 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM