Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
War on Cancer and Diabetes - Awareness Campaign
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish and promote a specified public information, awareness, and education campaign on cancer and diabetes; requiring the campaign to reach out to the general public and specified populations, disseminate specified information in a specified manner, and distribute materials free of charge to specified locations; authorizing the Secretary to request the services of interested advocacy groups and to contract for any necessary services; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 22
Senate 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM