Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Interfaith Works Resource Village
Sponsored by
Senator Forehand
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $500,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Interfaith Works, Inc. for specified development or improvement purposes related to the Interfaith Works Resource Village, located in Montgomery County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; establishing a deadline for the encumbrance or expenditure of the loan proceeds; etc.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0499
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM