Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 10/28/2020 11:17:34 PM
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
Senate
Health and Human Services Subcommittee
Change made: October 28, 2020 9:34 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Health and Human Services Subcommittee - Briefing
November 19, 2020 1:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: November 19, 2020 1:00 PM)
Virtual Meeting
Update on the Performance of Optum, the Administrative Services Organization for the Public Behavioral Health System

Other
Crime Classification and Penalties, Task Force to Study
Change made: October 28, 2020 4:23 PM - HEARING ADDED
Crime Classification and Penalties, Task Force to Study - Other
November 12, 2020 1:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
The meeting is open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
A livestream link to YouTube for the public will be provided prior to the start of the meeting.

Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority
Change made: October 28, 2020 9:42 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority - Other
November 4, 2020 9:00 AM
One Call Center, Suite 104, Lower Level Conference Rm., 7223 Parkway Drive, Hanover, MD
Meeting of Full Authority+Hearings