Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a Class 9 limited distillery license in Kent County; authorizing a Class 9 limited distillery license to be issued to a holder of a Class B beer, wine, and liquor license as well as a holder of a Class D beer, wine, and liquor license under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0925
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
51
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Second Reading Passed 42
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 44
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 51
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-401, 24-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM