Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Wage Payment and Collection - General Contractor Liability
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that certain contractors are jointly and severally liable for certain violations of the wage payment and collection law by certain subcontractors if the employee notified the general contractor, in writing, within 180 days after the violation occurred and the general contractor failed to cure the violation within 14 days after receiving the notice; prohibiting a certain obligation or contract right from being impaired by the Act; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/21 (Senator McCray) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {813026/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {633329/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Wage Payment and Collection - General Contractor Liability
Senate 3/14/2019 3/15/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable 50
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/21 (Senator McCray) Adopted 50
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable Adopted 51
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Floor Amendment {813026/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted 51
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Floor Amendment {633329/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted 51
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Wage Payment and Collection - General Contractor Liability
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM