Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Commercial Rehabilitations - Affordable Housing
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Eckardt, Madaleno, Middleton, Young, McFadden, and Muse
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 843
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing an additional 5% tax credit for certain expenditures under the Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit for certain commercial rehabilitations that qualify as affordable housing; requiring that the amount of an expired or unclaimed initial credit certificate remain in a certain Reserve Fund and increase the amount of initial credit certificates that the Maryland Historical Trust may issue for the following fiscal year; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1454
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {609032/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {585860/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-27)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 843
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Commercial Rehabilitations - Transferability and Affordable Housing
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {609032/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Commercial Rehabilitations - Transferability and Affordable Housing
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {585860/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (110-27) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Commercial Rehabilitations - Affordable Housing
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 843
Text - Chapter - Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Commercial Rehabilitations - Affordable Housing
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page