Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Small Business Reserve Program - Definition of Small Business - Repeal of Sunset Provision
Sponsored by
Senators Montgomery, Benson, Ramirez, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination provision of a specified provision of law relating to the definition of "small business" as used for the purposes of the Small Business Reserve Program.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0487
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed 43
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 45
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 47
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 62
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM