Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission to Study Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Funding
Sponsored by
Senators Ellis, Carozza, Gallion, Guzzone, Lam, Patterson, Rosapepe, Washington, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission to Study Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Funding to review the State's funding requirements for non-emergency medical transportation services and the impact on locally operated transit systems; requiring the Commission to consider certain matters as part of the study; providing for the composition, cochairs, and staffing of the Commission; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and to certain committees of the General Assembly by June 30, 2020; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0366
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commission to Study Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) and Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Finance) and Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Commission to Study Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Funding
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Finance and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) and Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing canceled (Finance) and Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM