Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the nonrefundable $100 fee charged by the State Department of Assessments and Taxation for processing articles of dissolution and certificates of cancellation filed by certain business entities with the Department.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0018
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0714 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page