Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Agreements
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky and Peters
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a county, before the transfer of an asset of the county as part of the development of a high-speed transportation system that passes through the county, if the asset is located in a municipality, to negotiate a certain written agreement with the municipality concerning the approval by and financial remuneration to the municipality.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0638
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Counties and Municipalities - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Agreements
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page