Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Education - Financial Literacy Curriculum - Graduation Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to require each public school to administer a specified test to each student before high school graduation during specified school years; requiring the State Board to develop curriculum content for a specified course in financial literacy to be taught beginning with a specified school year; requiring each county board of education to implement specified financial literacy curriculum content in specified high schools beginning with a specified school year; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2014 2/12/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-205.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM