Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Agricultural Certainty Program
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Dyson, Jennings, and Glassman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Agricultural Certainty Program; stating the intent of the General Assembly; establishing the purpose of the Program; requiring the Department of Agriculture to develop the Program in coordination with the Department of the Environment; requiring that the Program be self-sustaining and revenue neutral; requiring the Department of Agriculture to administer the Program; authorizing the Department of Agriculture to establish by regulation reasonable fees to cover operation of the Program; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {384732/1
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Raskin) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {384732/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/25 (Senator Forehand) Rejected (12-33)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {313422/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {123622/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-9)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {840917/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Mizeur) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Mizeur) {413521/1 Rejected
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Mizeur) {793725/1 Rejected (17-115)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Cardin) {143726/1 Rejected
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Frick) {373829/2 Rejected (15-112)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (105-27)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-10)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2013 2/26/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {384732/1 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Laid Over (Senator Raskin) Adopted 50
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {384732/1 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Motion Special Order until 3/25 (Senator Forehand) Rejected (12-33) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {313422/1 Adopted 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {123622/1 Adopted 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (38-9) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 55A
House 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {840917/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate Mizeur) Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Mizeur) {413521/1 Rejected 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Mizeur) {793725/1 Rejected (17-115) 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Cardin) {143726/1 Rejected 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Frick) {373829/2 Rejected (15-112) 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (105-27) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (37-10) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
3/22/2013 Amendments Senate - (Senator Glassman) {123622/01 Adopted
3/22/2013 Amendments Senate - (Senator Middleton) {313422/01 Adopted
3/22/2013 Amendments Senate - (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) {384732/01 Adopted
4/05/2013 Amendments House - (Delegate Cardin) {143726/01 Rejected
4/05/2013 Amendments House - (Delegate Frick) {373829/02 Rejected
4/05/2013 Amendments House - (Delegate Mizeur) {413521/01 Rejected
4/05/2013 Amendments House - (Delegate Mizeur) {793725/01 Rejected
4/05/2013 Amendments House - (Environmental Matters) {840917/01 Adopted
2/26/2013 Text - First - Maryland Agricultural Certainty Program
3/22/2013 Text - Third - Maryland Agricultural Certainty Program
4/09/2013 Text - Enrolled - Maryland Agricultural Certainty Program
5/09/2013 Text - Chapter - Maryland Agricultural Certainty Program
3/21/2013 Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2013 Vote - House - Committee - Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 Vote - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 3/25 (Forehand) Rejected (12-33) - 03/20/13
3/21/2013 Vote - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-9) - 03/21/13
4/04/2013 Vote - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-10) - 04/04/13
3/31/2013 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Mizeur) {793725/1 Rejected (17-115) - 03/31/13
3/31/2013 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Frick) {373829/2 Rejected (15-112) - 03/31/13
4/01/2013 Vote - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (105-27) - 04/01/13
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-1001 through 8-1013 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM